This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 16:16:15 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS FIGUEROA-PASTRANO

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FIGUEROA-PASTRANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6572

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

FIGUEROA-PASTRANO, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

BECK DWAYNE S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/28/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: G

Complaint

12/09/2021: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

12/13/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

12/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

12/13/2021: Order to Show Cause

Substitution of Attorneys

02/04/2022: Substitution of Attorneys

Notice

02/08/2022: Notice

Notice

02/08/2022: Notice

Declaration

03/11/2022: Declaration

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/10/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

05/17/2022: Answer to Complaint

Demand for Jury

05/17/2022: Demand for Jury

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

05/17/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

05/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Trial

06/13/2022: Notice of Trial

Case Management Conference

06/13/2022: Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Trial; Comment: 10/16/23, 9am, Div. L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Plaintiff; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FIGUEROA-PASTRANO, FERNANDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Demand for Jury; Comment: Defendant; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FIGUEROA-PASTRANO, FERNANDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FIGUEROA-PASTRANO, FERNANDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Jordan D Taylor in opposition to OSC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Fernando Figueroa-Pastrano, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Standing Order-Reassignment of civil cases from Department 12 and Division G to Division L and declaration of mailing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: Former Attorney: Gregg StrumwasserNew Attorney: Susan M Benson; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 03/28/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK DWAYNE S. ESQ.