This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:16 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. VS TARANGO

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TARANGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6202

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

Defendant

TARANGO, MARY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT, JOSEPH M

Attorney at HARLAN M REESE & ASSOCIATES

Reese Law Group 6725 Mesa Ridge Rd #240

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ~ calid=2206575 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/10/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/29/2013 2:35:53 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ~ calid=2206577 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:10/09/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/29/2013 2:36:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE (SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: #2 INCOMPLETE (SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from ADVANCED ATTORNEY SERVICES, IN, check no(s) 18754. Receipt #709873 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M PLEASANT, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M PLEASANT, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less