This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:14 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. VS MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6199

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

Defendant

MUNOZ, ISIDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT, JOSEPH M

Attorney at HARLAN M REESE & ASSOCIATES

Reese Law Group 6725 Mesa Ridge Rd #240

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: AS TO ISIDRO MUNOZ FILED BY HARLAN M. REESE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • 134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from REESE LAW GROUP, check no(s) 9561, 9560. Receipt #786866 for amount of $51.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • 180C Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from REESE LAW GROUP, check no(s) 9561, 9560. Receipt #786866 for amount of $51.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • 851A Pmt: Certification of Facts DMV ($10 Cert Mail + $15 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from REESE LAW GROUP, check no(s) 9561, 9560. Receipt #786866 for amount of $51.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL-30) TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT CONFORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M. PLEASANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from REESE LAW GROUP, check no(s) 6637. Receipt #753193 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M, PLEASANT, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AS TO ISIDRO MUNOZ JR AKA ISIDRO G MUNOZ JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 7/10/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2206535 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/10/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/29/2013 2:23:04 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO ISIDRO MUNOZ JR SUB SERVED 4/10/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (PL-1). Received from ADVANCED ATTORNEY SERVICES, IN, check no(s) 18767. Receipt #709874 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M PLEASANT, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH M PLEASANT, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less