This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:44:58 (UTC).

STARLITE MGMT IX LP VS PRENDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 STARLITE MGMT IX LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRENDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1692

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARLITE MGMT IX LP

Defendants

PRENDEZ, JOHN D

PRENDEZ, SHELLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

BOUZANE, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via S.A.S.E.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: STARLITE MGMT IX LP; Awarded Against: PRENDEZ, JOHN D; PRENDEZ, SHELLEY; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $850.00; Holdover Damages: $2,323.06; Attorney Fees: $350.00; Costs: $560.00; Total: $4,083.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: judgment by court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to John D Prendez, Shelley Prendez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: H. G. Long New Attorney: John Bouzane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MISC ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: STARLITE MGMT IX LP; Unserved; Served: 04/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1018 30TH ST BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less