This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 15:34:54 (UTC).

STARKS VS STARKS (D)

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 STARKS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STARKS D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Division Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Turner, Jerold L., Robertson, Murray J., Gill, Susan M., Marquez, Raymonda B., Camacho, Marcos R., Bittleston, Dawn and Louie, Chad A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2261

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Turner, Jerold L.

Robertson, Murray J.

Gill, Susan M.

Marquez, Raymonda B.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Louie, Chad A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARKS

Petitioner

STARKS, TIFFANY ELAINE

Defendant

STARKS (D)

Respondent

STARKS, BRIAN JAMAL

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 06/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: STARKS, TIFFANY ELAINE; Respondent: STARKS, BRIAN JAMAL

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/28/19 RES C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: STARKS, TIFFANY ELAINE; Respondent: STARKS, BRIAN JAMAL

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/28/19 RES C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 7/31/19 *1

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/28/19 RES C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 7/31/19, 11/08/19 *2

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/28/19 RES C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 7/31/19, 11/08/19, 01/24/20

Ruling

Ruling 03/30/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 05/14/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EX-PARTE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EX PARTE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: POS- MAILED BACK

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Comment: STATUS 3/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TAX RETURN 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: HRG 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 11/4/2020 PET MOD C/C C/V 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/16/20 PET COMPEL COMP W/ DISCLOSURES CONT'D FROM 6/16/20, 8/4/20, 9/28/20 & 10/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH HRG 10/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: POS- MAILED BACK

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 6/28/19 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division: D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM C/S H/C STNDRD ORDERS, INTERVENE 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 8/21/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starks is a litigant