This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2022 at 11:15:50 (UTC).

SPRINT VS COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 SPRINT filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1547

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS, L.P.

Defendants

COUNTY OF KERN

THE STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEITHKE, ERIC J

BOERSCH, MARTHA A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Sanctions in the indicated amount of Two Hundred Fifty and 00/100 Dollars ($250.00) directed to Plaintiff's counsel for failing to appear on 10/21/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont'd from 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Continuing Case Deadlines Having reviewed Plaintiff/Claimant's Notice re: Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code section 5147 and god cause having been shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 4, 2022, is continued to September 5, 2022, to allow time for service of the Complaint under section 5147 and for the defendants to file a response. If Claimant serves the Complaint before the one-year time limit prescribed by section 5147 it will notify the Court and request that the Case management Conference be rescheduled for an earlier date. IT IS SO ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 11/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Sanctions in the indicated amount of Two Hundred Fifty and 00/100 Dollars ($250.00) directed to Plaintiff's counsel for failing to appear on 10/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice Re: Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear - Comment: and Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: You and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on November 29, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department/Division 17 of the above entitled court, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter sanctions in the amount of $250.00 should not be imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: for failing to appear on October 21, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/21/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/21/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boersch, Martha A