This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:34 (UTC).

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC VS THOMAS, Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMAS, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5768

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendant

THOMAS, DAVID W, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAMER, TODD L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on April 25, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 6/27/17, 8/30am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to David W Thomas Jr. 6 attempts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: 7 attempts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to David W. Thomas Jr. 4 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less