This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 05:09:01 (UTC).

SPRADLIN VS GRAUER

Case Summary

On 11/17/2011 SPRADLIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRAUER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9924

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRADLIN, WANDA

Defendant

GRAUER, TANYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2012
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.50 for SPRADLIN, WANDA (PL-1). Received from JILL JONES, check no(s) 264. Receipt #666136 for amount of $1.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COST: $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for SPRADLIN, WANDA (PL-1). Received from LINDA STARKEY. Receipt #625570 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ISSUED ~ calid=1764270 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:02/27/2012, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:donnas2, SystemDate:11/17/2011 3:43:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: TO KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: RE: TANYA GRAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: TANYA GRAUER COST: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Feb 27, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Feb 27, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 107 SAN EMIDIO STREET TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for SPRADLIN, WANDA (PL-1). Received from WANDA SPRADLIN. Receipt #623971 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 578

    Read MoreRead Less