Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:52 (UTC).

SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC VS WALTERS

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALTERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC

Defendant

WALTERS, CHARLES D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TASHNEK, DANIEL L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 155 Locust Ln. Kernville, CA 93238; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: WALTERS, CHARLES D.; Party: Names: SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC; WALTERS, CHARLES D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of Service, Request for Dismissal, Request to Enter Default, Judgment and Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: All Unknown Occupants c/o Charles Walters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Charles Walters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SPLIT MOUNTAIN LLC, TASHNEK, DANIEL L.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less