This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 02:47:52 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY VS LES DIFFENBAUGH ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LES DIFFENBAUGH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0937

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LES DIFFENBAUGH, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DOING BUSINESS AS DEVIL'S DEN IRRIGATION, A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ENTITY

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PARAMOUNT FARMS, A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ENTITY

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC DBA PARAMOUNT FARMS

LES DIFFENBAUGH, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA DEVIL'S DEN IRRIGATION

Cross Plaintiff

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN, SCOTT

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PECHT, J P

DHILLON, SUMMIT S

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

DHILLON, SUMMIT S

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Certificate of Process: Page 2 states investigators/process servers report is attached; report is not attached. Advised Scott Freedman telephonically document is being rejected.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Certificat of Progress: Page 3, Proposed Order states "OSC Re: Dismissal" that is incorrect, OSC Re: CRC 3.110 or OSC Re: Service is the hearing on calendar; Correct and resubmit

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Scott Freedman; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Corrections needed- #2 does not indicate if Cross Complaint was served; Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint, needs correction on #3.a.; #5 missing authorized code section; #6 needs correction; Missing signed return receipt or signed Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Scott A Freedman Re: Proof of Service - Civil by Mail Service as to defendant Les Diffenbaugh dba Devi's Den Irrigation Reason: This form cannot be used for service of summons and complaint. It is required to use Judicial Council form POS-010

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:James Pecht; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a.; also #6 needs correction (only indicates Party was served as an individual.)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: James Pecht Re: Summons & Cross-Complaint, Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint. The names of the Cross-Defendants and the names of the Cross-Complainant must match exactly to what is listed on the Cross-Complaint. Also there are boxes on the Summons that are blocking where we place our file stamp. On Cross-Complaint please conform the name of the Cross-Complainants throughout the document and resubmit together with the Summons on Cross-Complaint. Thank you.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/23/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 4 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT LES DIFFENBAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 1/4/21 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 4 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel - Comment: January 1, 2021 - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Jury TriaI/Final Case Management Conference set January 4, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 11. Mandatory Settlement Conference set December 4, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 10/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: James Pecht Re: Summons & Cross-Complaint, Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint. The names of the Cross-Defendants and the names of the Cross-Complainant must match exactly to what is listed on the Cross-Complaint. Also there are boxes on the Summons that are blocking where we place our file stamp. On Cross-Complaint please conform the name of the Cross-Complainants throughout the document and resubmit together with the Summons on Cross-Complaint. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: By Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC DBA Paramount Farms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defendant Paramount Farms, a California business entity; Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defendant Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC, a Delaware Corporation; Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 04/15/2019; Served: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/23/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dhillon, Summit S.