This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 09:01:33 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS COUNTY OF KERN, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2367

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

COUNTY OF KERN, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, NAZILA YAMIN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/26/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/26/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.