This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 14:03:32 (UTC).

SOUTH VS WOODSIDE 06N, LP

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 SOUTH filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WOODSIDE 06N, LP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2251

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REDSTONE, JEANETTE

RENDER-MASTON, RONNIE

BRIDGES, CLEMENTINA

SWARTZ, STEPHEN

GARNER, TRAVIS

VAN SKIKE, STEPHANIE

SMITH, RONALD

GEPHART, ROBERT

KAUR, KULSHARAN

SAFEEH, TARIK

RODRIGUEZ, CELINA

THOMAS, ARNOLD

SOUTH, ERIC

SWARTZ, SYLVIA

ISENMAN, STEVEN

WILLIAMS, GERALDINE

CHEN, JIAJIA

CANALES, JANET

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WOODSIDE 06N, LP

WOODSIDE HOMES OF FRESNO, INC

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SU, JOSEPH J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action; Filed By: 1436914369; Filed Against: 1436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369143691436914369

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action - Cross Action Cross-Complaint; File Date: 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: Cross Complaint - $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Appointing Special Master Granted as to Grant Woodruff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint - $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Woodside 06N, LP, Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Woodside Homes of Fresno, Inc., Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/20201:05 PM; Served: 10/15/20201:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODSIDE HOMES OF FRESNO, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODSIDE 06N, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, DANIEL J