This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/07/2020 at 10:31:10 (UTC).

SOTO VS GONZALES

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 SOTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GONZALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1399

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTO, DAVID

Defendants

GONZALES, MANUEL

ROCHA, SERVANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 04/23/2020 BY STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: As to Servando Rocha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Manuel Gonzales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SOTO, DAVID; Served: 02/24/20207:30 PM; Served: 02/25/20203:19 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.