This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 08:00:01 (UTC).

SOLORZANO VS RIVERA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 SOLORZANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RIVERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2085

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLORZANO, YESICA RUBIO

SANTOS, ERIKA

Defendant

RIVERA, RICHAR LEIVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHN, PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS, MATTHEW S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/27/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 12

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: We cannot accept Summons in lieu of Proof of Service. Also, the original Proof of Service was processed on 06/18/2021. Please review.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont. from 10/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 10/12/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Defendant's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: We cannot accept Summons in lieu of Proof of Service. Also, the original Proof of Service was processed on 06/18/2021. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Richar Leiva Rivera via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/15/20216:48 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/27/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AHN PAUL S.