This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2019 at 07:07:58 (UTC).

SOFER VS ESPOSO

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 SOFER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESPOSO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6604

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOFER, MORDECHAI

MORDECHAI SOFER (PREVIOUS OWNER; SOLD PROPERTY

Defendant

ESPOSO, ORIENTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 5/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: SOFER, MORDECHAI; Defendant: ESPOSO, ORIENTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM SENT TO ORIENTE ESPOSO BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO ORIENTO ESPOSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: SENT ON 4/9/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 855A Pmt: Service by Certified Mail (Per Party) CCP 116.232 - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for SOFER, (PL-1). Received from SOFER. Receipt #709330 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for SOFER, (PL-1). Received from SOFER. Receipt #709330 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 609

    Read MoreRead Less