This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:44:51 (UTC).

SOEST VS MOJAVE AIR AND SPACE PORT

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 SOEST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOJAVE AIR AND SPACE PORT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOEST, ERNEST DEAN

Defendant

MOJAVE AIR AND SPACE PORT

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 07/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN; Defendant: MOJAVE AIR AND SPACE PORT

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial; Parties Present Plaintiff: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN; MOJAVE AIR AND SPACE PORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 07/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: FOR KARINA DREES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NEW SMALL CLAIMSN FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SOEST, ERNEST DEAN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less