Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:14 (UTC).

SOCORRO F LUQUE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 SOCORRO F LUQUE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Lampe, David R., Benavides, Jose R., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2204

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Lampe, David R.

Benavides, Jose R.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, DIANA

Not Classified By Court

SIERRA, ANTONIO PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HULSY, JAMES R

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DULCICH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 10/02/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing. SAME NEW NOTE - 1. As of 10/02/19, 850 petition has not been filed.

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 04/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 04/03/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing. NEW NOTE - 1. As of 04/03/19, 850 petition has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 09/26/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Case Management Conference

10/13/2017 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, DIANA; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Final Case Management Conference

09/06/2017 MO: Final Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, DIANA; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R; Objector: SIERRA, ANTONIO PADILLA

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Case Management Conference

7/21/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, DIANA; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Ruling

MO - Probate Ruling w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

MO re: CMC for Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, DIANA; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R; Objector: SIERRA, ANTONIO PADILLA

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: LOPEZ, DIANA; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/23/2020, HEARING CONTINUED FROM 04/01/2020*** NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 10/13/20, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing. SAME NEW NOTE - 1. As of 10/13/20, 850 petition has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 10/02/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing. SAME NEW NOTE - 1. As of 10/02/19, 850 petition has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 04/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 04/03/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing. NEW NOTE - 1. As of 04/03/19, 850 petition has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 10/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 09/26/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketLetters Testamentary - Comment: Letters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: Order Appointing Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Notice of Lodging of the Socorro F. Luque Living Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 8/20/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-15-001054 4/11/15 Six (6) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DULCICH, JOHN S