Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 10:43:49 (UTC).

SNELL VS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA) INC.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 SNELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS USA INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0465

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES SNELL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

SNELL, JAMES

Defendant

G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA) INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SZAMET, KELSEY M.

HAINES, WALTER L.

Defendant Attorney

WRIGHT, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/17/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/17/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT MICHAEL J