Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 21:26:51 (UTC).

SMITH VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 05/05/2014 SMITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Errea, Larry A., Katz, Steven M. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1921

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Errea, Larry A.

Katz, Steven M.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, MARY MARGARET

Respondent

SMITH, ADAM LEE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SMITH, MARY MARGARET; Respondent: SMITH, ADAM LEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 07/24/2015 AND RULING 08/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketUnder Submission Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketCase Under Submission for Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 04/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS ON SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: Document Image; MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 11/14/14. PER JUDGE JUDITH K. DULCICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image; filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less