This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:37:09 (UTC).

SLOAN VS CLARK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 SLOAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0373

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLOAN, JOSEPH

Defendants

SMITH-CLARK, MARCHELL DENISE

CLARK, MICHAEL JEROME

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO: Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: SLOAN, JOSEPH; Defendant: CLARK, MICHAEL JEROME; Defendant: SMITH-CLARK, MARCHELL DENISE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SLOAN, JOSEPH; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2890 Acacia Street, Rosamond, CA 93501, Kern County; Awarded Against: CLARK, MICHAEL JEROME; SMITH-CLARK, MARCHELL DENISE; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $690.00; Total: $690.00; Party: Names: SLOAN, JOSEPH; CLARK, MICHAEL JEROME; SMITH-CLARK, MARCHELL DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: Judge notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO: Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: MARCHELL DENICE SMITH-CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Request to set case for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MICHAEL JEROME CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MARCHELL DENICE SMITH-CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SLOAN, JOSEPH; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less