This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 07:19:33 (UTC).

SINOBAGO VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 SINOBAGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0823

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINOBAGO, ROBERT

Defendants

NIETO, FREDIE

MARTINEZ, CAMERINO GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLADAY, BRANDON B

Defendant Attorney

COZAD, JULIA P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/28/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to all parties and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Fredie Nieto via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Camerino Gomez Martinez via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/20/20215:50 PM; Served: 04/20/20215:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/28/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLADAY, BRANDON B