This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:52:07 (UTC).

SIMRANJIT DEOL VS AEGIS ENERGY GLOBAL INNOVATION SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 SIMRANJIT DEOL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AEGIS ENERGY GLOBAL INNOVATION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1567

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEOL, SIMRANJIT

Defendants

AEGIS ENERGY GLOBAL INNOVATION SERVICES LLC

DAVIS, KEVIN

ANSARI, ASIF

STEVENS, WAYNE

KINETIC RENEWABLE ENERGY SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUMPH, RANDY M

Defendant Attorney

FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Final Case Management Conference

Jury Trial 08/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 02/26/18, 04/30/18 **OSC RE: DISMISSAL AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE ALSO ON CAL**; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (continued from 02/26/2018); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (continued from 01/08/2018); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant: ANSARI, ASIF

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition) 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/28/2017 PLAINTIFF SIMRANJIT DEOL MOTION TO AMEND HIS COMPLAINT ResID: 28750; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant: ANSARI, ASIF

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant: ANSARI, ASIF

Ruling

Ruling 01/15/2020: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC RE DISMISSAL AS TO ASIF ANSARI

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 09/04/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/13/2019 Plaintiff: SIMRANJIT DEOL Motion fro Order Allowing Service of Summons by Publication and by Certified Mail ResID: 35571 [*DRL Case* Matter transferred to Dept.10 for hearing purposes only]

Ruling

Ruling 08/22/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Document must be properly named for motions calendar

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Application: All pleadings must be filed separate, not as one document. Please separate your declarations.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 8/12/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 3-4 DAYS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CONT'D FROM 12/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: cont'd from 11/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Complaint/Entire Action of all Parties and all Causes of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/15/2020: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 11/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Wayne Stevens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: OSC RE DISMISSAL AS TO ASIF ANSARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 09/04/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/13/2019 Plaintiff: SIMRANJIT DEOL Motion fro Order Allowing Service of Summons by Publication and by Certified Mail ResID: 35571 [*DRL Case* Matter transferred to Dept.10 for hearing purposes only]

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION GRANTED ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO ASIF ANSARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ASIF ANSARI , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 08/18/2017; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less