This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 11:36:22 (UTC).

SIMONSON VS CARTER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 SIMONSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1811

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMONSON, JOHN L.

SIMONSON, TERRY L.

Defendant

CARTER, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONSON, JOHN L

Defendant Attorney

BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 06/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/17/2018 PLAINTIFF TERRY L. SIMONSON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF TANGIBLE THINGS ResID: 30653; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Ruling

Ruling 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 05/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/4/2018 PLAINTIFF TERRY L. SIMONSON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. THREE ResID: 29558; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER RECIEVED FOR MOTION

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MOTION RESERVATION REQUIRED

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney returned via USPS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney and Summons returned via SASE

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 03/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: JURY FOR THE PLAINTIFF - PLAINTIFF WAS ORDERED TO POST FEES WITHIN TEN DAYS FROM 2/05/18; Parties Present Plaintiff: SIMONSON, JOHN L.; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Defendant: CARTER, DEBRA; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H; Plaintiff: SIMONSON, TERRY L.; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 03/18/2019: GENERAL TRIAL ORDER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: SIMONSON, JOHN L.; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Defendant: CARTER, DEBRA; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H; Plaintiff: SIMONSON, TERRY L.; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 02/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: order subpoenaed witnesses back for trial on 3/18/19 9am dept 11 witnesses are: Ronnie Bouerhring and Brenda Carter; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

Ruling

Ruling 02/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 04:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/15/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 02/25/19 9AM DEPT 11 PLAINTIFF JURY

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Address - ELECTRONIC FILING IS NOW MANDATORY IN KERN. RE-SUBMIT YOUR DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY.

Ruling

Ruling 11/21/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 08/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 08/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/28/18 Plaintiffs, TERRY L SIMONSON; JOHN L SIMONSON Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Inspection of Land, Set no. One ResID: 31339; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L; Plaintiff; Attorney: SIMONSON, JOHN L

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: DEFENDANT'S/PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Move for A New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment filed 3/21/19 addressed to ROBERT BRUMFIELD returned to the court undelivered. Re-mailed to address as follows: 1810 WESTWIND DRIVE SUITE 100 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Jury Verdict (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: REDACTED JURY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSealed Jury Information pursuant to CCP 237 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Jury Alpha List Jury Random List Juror Phone List Seated Juror Key Case Info Cover Sheet Original Jury Note(s) Jury fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketInstructions Given

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketVerdict - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO TERRY L. SIMONSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO TERRY L. SIMONSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO JOHN L. SIMONSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO JOHN L. SIMONSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/20/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.