This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 21:25:31 (UTC).

SIMONS VS SIMONS

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 SIMONS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SIMONS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0062

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIMONS, HEATHER M.

Respondent

SIMONS, NATHAN PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON, LESLIE

Respondent Attorney

SILVA, WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: SIMONS, HEATHER M.; SIMONS, NATHAN PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 4/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: NOT DATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver - Comment: NOT DATED BY RESP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less