This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:30:38 (UTC).

SILVA VS BOWYER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SILVA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOWYER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5916

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVA, MARCO

Defendant

BOWYER, ADRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SILVA, MARCO; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1009 WATER ST #B BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: BOWYER, ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: return via Effective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: ADRIAN BOWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SILVA, MARCO; Served: 10/21/20171:26 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1009 WATER ST #B, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less