This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 11:23:42 (UTC).

SIERRA CLUB VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS, AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES

Case Summary

On 10/22/2015 SIERRA CLUB filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS, AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Twisselman II, Kenneth C, Palmer, William D., Bradshaw, J. Eric, Camacho, Marcos R. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1300

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Twisselman II, Kenneth C

Palmer, William D.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Camacho, Marcos R.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIERRA CLUB

Respondent

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS, AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES

Interested Parties

CALIFORNIA RESOURCE CORPORATION

MK OPERATING, LLC

KERN COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NAFICY, BABAK

Respondent Attorney

SLOAN-TRIBE, WYATT E

Interested Party Attorneys

WICKERSHAM, MATTHEW C

DINTZER, JEFFREY D

COLLINS, CHARLES F

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter re: proposed amended judgment

Ruling

05/18/16 MO: Ruling: Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

05/04/16: MO: Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: Demurrer of California Resources Corporation to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Parties Present Petitioner: SIERRA CLUB; Attorney: NAFICY, BABAK; Respondent: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS, AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES; Attorney: SLOAN-TRIBE, WYATT E; Real Party Interest: CALIFORNIA RESOURCE CORPORATION; Attorney: DINTZER, JEFFREY D; Attorney: WICKERSHAM, MATTHEW C; Real Party Interest: MK OPERATING, LLC; Real Party Interest: KERN COUNTY; Attorney: COLLINS, CHARLES F

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order- Ruling: Judicial Officer: Twisselman II, Kenneth C; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketAmended Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter re: proposed amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Ruling dated 5/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Comment: Re; amended order re demurrers by real parties of interest kern county and California Resources corporation to Sierra Club's Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Judgment entered June 07, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL, AS TO, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES. 10/30/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL, AS TO, MK OPERATING, LLC. 10/29/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Assigned to Judge Kenneth C. Twisselman, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SIERRA CLUB; Served: 10/30/2015; Served: 11/03/2015; Served: 10/29/2015; Served: 11/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SIERRA CLUB; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketNotice - Comment: PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCase Filed Pursuant to the California Environmental - Comment: Quality Act (CEQA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate - Comment: and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: [Electronically Filed]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less