Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:31:24 (UTC).

SIEMON VS SIEMON

Case Summary

On 04/11/2016 SIEMON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SIEMON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0120

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM

Respondent

SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/13/17: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM; Respondent: SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM; Respondent: SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - Request for Order 11/14/16: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM; Respondent: SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/17/2016: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM; Respondent: SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: SIEMON, JOHN WILLIAM; SIEMON, ARMIDA ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/13/17: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less