This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 08:47:21 (UTC).

SIDNEY TOLIVER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 SIDNEY TOLIVER DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2803

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOLIVER, VALERIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 09/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER FOR PROBATE MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Re: Report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER FOR PROBATE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 09/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H