This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:37 (UTC).

SIDHU VS SIDHU

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 SIDHU filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SIDHU. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1766

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIDHU, HARPREET SINGH

Respondent

SIDHU, RAJVIR KAUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 04/17/2017 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketRequest and Order to Continue Hearing and Extend Temporary - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: HRG 05/30/2017 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.