Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:15 (UTC).

SIDHU VS DUARTE (B)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 SIDHU filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUARTE B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1618

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIDHU, SURJET

Respondent

DUARTE, EMMA H

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO SURJET SIDHU: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 8/18/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET; Respondent: DUARTE, EMMA H

Mandatory Settlement Conference

6/30/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 1HR; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET; Respondent: DUARTE, EMMA H

Court Trial

Court Trial 10/26/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Trial - Court Trial 10/26/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 09/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Mediated Agreement - Settlement of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 8/18/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET; Respondent: DUARTE, EMMA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Stipulation to Continue and Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: CONT'D FRM 8/18/16 NEW DATE 9/8/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: TIME EST: 1 HR CONT'D FROM 6/30/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET; Respondent: DUARTE, EMMA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 6/30/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 1HR; Parties Present Petitioner: SIDHU, SURJET; Respondent: DUARTE, EMMA H

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Fee(s) Paid After Fee Waiver Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO SURJET SIDHU: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less