This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:51:23 (UTC).

SICKLER VS LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SICKLER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2235

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUBALCADO, GUADALUPE

WASSON, LARRY

BROOKS, JONATHAN

CAMPBELL, ASHLEY

BROOKS, BRANDY

VOELKERS, REGINA

ROMINE, SHANNON

NORMAN, ADRIAN

ZANINOVICH, LORETTA

RUBALCADO, YOLANDA

FARMER, TERESA

LANE, LUKE

REDDELL, DESIRAE

GREWAL, SUKWINDER

WASSON, LUCINDA

FREELS, CHRISTOPHER

CAMPBELL, ADAM

FARMER, JOHN

ZERBEL, GINA

Defendant

LENNAR FRESNO, INC.

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SU, JOSEPH J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/08/2020; Served: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less