This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:53:30 (UTC).

SHOCKLEY VS SHOCKLEY (E)

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 SHOCKLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHOCKLEY E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Fielder, John L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1650

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN

Respondent

SHOCKLEY, JEREMY ROAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO KATYE SHOCKLEY: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN

Request for Order - Petitioner

06/08/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C AMEND PETITION 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 5/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN

Request for Order - Petitioner

07/08/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/ TRIAL JUDGEMENT: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C AMEND 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 6/8/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN; Respondent: SHOCKLEY, JEREMY ROAM

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/10/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C AMEND PETITION 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN; Respondent: SHOCKLEY, JEREMY ROAM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RET'D JUDGMENT VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - 07/08/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/ TRIAL JUDGEMENT: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C AMEND 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 6/8/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN; Respondent: SHOCKLEY, JEREMY ROAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - 06/08/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C AMEND PETITION 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 5/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: GEORGE R HORRIGAN New Attorney: PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO KATYE SHOCKLEY: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: SHOCKLEY, KATYE LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less