This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:16:46 (UTC).

SHIPP VS. SHIPP

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 SHIPP filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHIPP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Schuett, Stephen D. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4716

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHIPP, DANYL

Respondent

SHIPP, ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARBONE, ROBERT F

Attorney at LAW OFC ROBERT F CARBONE

1215 Eye St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

THOMAS, EDWARD J

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Attorney at LAW OFC MICHAEL R KILPATRICK

1122 Truxtun Ave #200

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2015
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: KILPATRICK WITHDRWALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/9/2013 SDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • NP1045A - Comment: Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: HOLIDAY SCHEDULE AND SUPPORT ISSUES TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DANYL SHIPP (PE-1) APPEARS WITH EDWARD J THOMAS. ROBIN SHIPP (RE-1) APPEARS WITH ANDREW C SMITH. *************************************************************************************** PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - RESPONDENT. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS THAT IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES HAVE ARISEN LEADING TO THE IRREMEDIABLE BREAKDOWN OF THE MARRIAGE. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. STIPULATION OF PARTIES ENTERED INTO FOR JUDGMENT JUDGMENT IS SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE AND ATTORNEY EDWARD THOMAS TO SUBMITTED SIGNED JUDGMENT TO FAMILY LAW DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • NP1080 - Comment: Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ANDREW C. SMITH MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL R KILPATRICK ON BEHALF OF ROBIN SHIPP (RE-1). ALSO PRESENT: DANYL SHIPP . NO APPEARANCE BY MR. CARBONE MATTER IS TRAILED TO TOMORROW TO ALLOW MR. CARBONE TO APPEAR. RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE. CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 3/29/2013 AT 11:00 AM IN DIV/DEPT B FOR HEARING ON CAL: EX PARTE BEFORE THE HON. STEPHEN D SCHUETT OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 4037 Ex Parte - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET EXPARTE C/C C/V 730 EVAL 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET EXPARTE C/C C/V 730 EVAL 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SHIPP, DANYL; Respondent: SHIPP, ROBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Ex Parte Compliance - Comment: HRG: 3/28/13 1100AM DIV.MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for SHIPP, DANYL (PE-1). Received from DANYL SHIPP, check no(s) 4383. Receipt #709323 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for SHIPP, DANYL (PE-1). Received from DANYL SHIPP, check no(s) 4383. Receipt #709323 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 695

    Read MoreRead Less