This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 12:30:46 (UTC).

SHIFLETT VS HANNON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 SHIFLETT filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Annulment lawsuit against HANNON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8032

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Annulment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHIFLETT, ELIZABETH

Respondent

HANNON, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SILVA, WAYNE

912 Perdew Ave #C

Ridgecrest, CA 93555

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DocketJudgment of Nullity - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DocketAppointment of Court Commissioner/Judge Pro Tem - Comment: Commissioner Glennon to hear matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DocketNP1085 - Comment: Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: DEFAULT NULLITY REQUEST THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ELIZABETH SHIFLETT (PE-1) APPEARS WITH WAYNE SILVA ESQ. NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. DEFAULT HERETOFORE HAVING BEEN REGULARLY ENTERED. PROPOSED JUDGMENT APPROVED. JUDGMENT OF NULLITY GRANTED PURSUANT TO FC 2210(D) DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Docket4004 Default - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DocketDefault - Original Type: Default; Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketDefault Setting Card - Comment: FOR:DEFAULT HEARING HEARING DATE:8/27/14 HEARING TIME:9;00 AM HEARING DEPT/DIV:BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS NULLITY/DISSO SERVED 04/01/14 BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - REJECTED BECAUSE #3B DATE IS STILL INCOMPLETE, SEE PREVIOUS PINK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - REJECTED BECAUSE #5 IS INCOMPLETE & #3B DATE IS INCOMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. FL330 #3 AND ATTACHED DECLARATION DOES NOT MATCH AS TO WHAT IS BEING LISTED AS SERVED 1 STATES PETITION & 1 STATES COMPLAINT - THE COURT CAN NOT DETERMINE WHAT WAS SERVED. 2. FL330 #3 DOES NOT STATE WHAT TYPE OF PETITION WAS SERVED. 3. FL300 #2 STATES PARTY PERSONALLY SERVED HOWEVER PARTY LISTED IS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE TO BE PERSONALLY SERVED. 4. FL300 IS THE INCORRECT PROOF OF SERVICE IF SERVING SUMMONS & PETITION PLEASE SEE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FL115.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketPetition for Nullity - Comment: NULLITY OR DISSOLUTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for SHIFLETT, ELIZABETH (PE-1). Received from PETITIONER, check no(s) 30497. Receipt #758161 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVA, WAYNE