This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 07:25:02 (UTC).

SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. VS DORSETT

Case Summary

On 11/01/2013 SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DORSETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7922

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC

DANIEL'S JEWELERS

Defendant

DORSETT, BRADLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: FILED BY: DUANE S OLIVEIRA, ESQ RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ABSTRACT # 3 MUST BE JUDGMENT CREDITOR RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC (PL-1). Received from RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 8246. Receipt #767774 for amount of $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC (PL-1). Received from RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 8246. Receipt #767774 for amount of $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: FILED BY DUANE S OLIVEIRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: ATTORNEY DUANE S OLIVEIRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment - Comment: AS TO KBR INC., DBA RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ANTHONY IASPARRO APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** ANTHONY IASPARRO DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1,052.55 PLUS COURT COSTS TO BE DETERMINED BY THE CLERK. ORIGINAL CONTRACT CANCELED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO BRADLEY DORSETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC (PL-1). Received from RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 7680. Receipt #747661 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO ANTHONY IASPARRO- AUTHORIZED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO ANTHONY IASPARRO-AUTHORIZED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant