This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 13:31:31 (UTC).

SHERMAN VS REED

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 SHERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REED. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0233

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERMAN, DAVANELL

Defendant

REED, JOSHUA

Guardian Ad Litem

SHERMAN, DASHALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/25/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

01/25/2023: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

01/25/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

01/25/2023: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

07/24/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/10/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: APPOINTING DASHALL SHERMAN AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DAVANELL SHERMAN A MINOR; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SHERMAN, DAVANELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SHERMAN, DAVANELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SHERMAN, DAVANELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SHERMAN, DAVANELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less