This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 00:35:24 (UTC).

SHEPHERD-TROTH VS SNOW, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 SHEPHERD-TROTH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SNOW. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0256

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPHERD-TROTH, JODIE M.

Defendants

SNOW, RAYMOND EDWARD

PALMER, CHERIE (CLAUDIA)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: MAILED-ALL VALLEY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Party: Name: SHEPHERD-TROTH, JODIE M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: UD-150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO ALL UNNAMED TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO RAYMOND EDWARD SNOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO ALL UNNAMED TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO CHERIE (CLAUDIA) PALMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SHEPHERD-TROTH, JODIE M.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 15673 M STREET, UNIT A MOJAVE CA 93501 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less