This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:07 (UTC).

SHEHEE VS SILVA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SHEHEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5896

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEHEE, TERRY

Defendant

SILVA, RACHEL

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: SHEHEE, TERRY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No proof of service on filed. Answer filed 11/21/17

Demurrer

Demurrer 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Parties Present Defendant: SILVA, RACHEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Demurrer 11/20/2017: Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 02/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 1/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketAmended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No proof of service on filed. Answer filed 11/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Hearing Date: 11/20/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SHEHEE, TERRY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1102 GAGE STREET APT D, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less