This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:50:58 (UTC).

SHEARER VS SHEARER

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 SHEARER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHEARER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0074

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEARER, JULIE

Respondents

SHEARER, STEVEN C

SHEARER, STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEIN, ROGER I

Respondent Attorneys

CONWAY, RICHARD C

DUNNE, JENNIFER E.

 

Court Documents

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 05/30/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: DUNNE, JENNIFER E.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: DUNNE, JENNIFER E.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

MO-PET OSC RE: DV: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Respondent: SHEARER, STEVEN C

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 12/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: SHEARER, STEVE; Attorney: DUNNE, JENNIFER E.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Respondent: SHEARER, STEVE; Attorney: DUNNE, JENNIFER E.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: SHEARER, JULIE; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: SHEARER, STEVE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Jennifer E. Dunne Regarding Death of Respondent, Steven Shearer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfirmation of Special Setting - Confirmation of Special Setting 05/30/2018: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: TO CONTIUNE HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: Joint Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketAt Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Service Date: 07/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response and Request for Dissolution of Marriage w/ UCCJEA attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less