This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 01:03:02 (UTC).

SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 SHAH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zulfa, David, Clark, Thomas S. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zulfa, David

Clark, Thomas S.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAH, YOGESH

Defendants

JOHNSON, STEVEN

THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESIMONE, V. JAMES

Defendant Attorney

DAMRON-HSIAO, KYMBERLEIGH A N

 

Court Documents

First Amended Complaint

05/18/2022: First Amended Complaint

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

04/28/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Answer to First Amended Complaint

06/24/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer to Complaint

03/03/2022: Answer to Complaint

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

08/10/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/17/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

07/06/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Complaint

01/11/2022: Complaint

Answer to First Amended Complaint

06/24/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Trial Setting Conference 05/11/2023

05/11/2023: Trial Setting Conference 05/11/2023

CMC & OSC 3.110 - 07/12/2022

07/12/2022: CMC & OSC 3.110 - 07/12/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/07/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/28/2022

04/28/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/28/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

02/17/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

02/10/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

01/13/2022: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Trial Setting Conference

05/11/2023: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

06/06/2023: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100090; Style/Defendant: SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL; Case Type: 36-CV Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E = 12-15 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100090; Style/Defendant: SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL; Case Type: 36-CV Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JT = 06/24/24 T/E 12-15 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100090; Style/Defendant: SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL; Case Type: 36-CV Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Clark, Thomas S.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC: 06/21/2024 // JT: 06/24/2024 // T/E: 12-15 days (D-H)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: JT C/C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 12-15 days. Final CMC C/C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: FCMC & JT: 09/05/2022 @ 9:00am in Div J at 1215 Truxtun Ave; T/E: 12-15 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Steven Johnson via personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Pas to Thrifty Payless Holdings, Inc. DBA Rite Aid Corporation via personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service x 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 02/01/202210:21 AM; Served: 01/28/20229:15 AM; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/28/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less