This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/07/2023 at 08:00:35 (UTC).

SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 SHAH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Barmann, Bernard C., Jr., Zulfa, David and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

Zulfa, David

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAH, YOGESH

Defendants

JOHNSON, STEVEN

THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESIMONE, V. JAMES

Defendant Attorney

DAMRON-HSIAO, KYMBERLEIGH A N

 

Court Documents

First Amended Complaint

05/18/2022: First Amended Complaint

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

04/28/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Answer to First Amended Complaint

06/24/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer to Complaint

03/03/2022: Answer to Complaint

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

08/10/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/17/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

07/06/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Complaint

01/11/2022: Complaint

Answer to First Amended Complaint

06/24/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Ruling 11/03/2023

11/03/2023: Ruling 11/03/2023

Trial Setting Conference 05/11/2023

05/11/2023: Trial Setting Conference 05/11/2023

CMC & OSC 3.110 - 07/12/2022

07/12/2022: CMC & OSC 3.110 - 07/12/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/07/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/28/2022

04/28/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/28/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

02/17/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

02/10/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

01/13/2022: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Trial Setting Conference

05/11/2023: Trial Setting Conference

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/24/2024

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E = 12-15 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2024

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JT = 06/24/24 T/E 12-15 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2024

DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FCMC: 06/21/2024 // JT: 06/24/2024 // T/E: 12-15 days (D-H)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100090; Style/Defendant: SHAH VS THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS, INC. ET AL; Case Type: 36-CV Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Ruling; Location: B-Civil; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRuling; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: JT C/C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 12-15 days. Final CMC C/C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: FCMC & JT: 09/05/2022 @ 9:00am in Div J at 1215 Truxtun Ave; T/E: 12-15 Days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
02/17/2022

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Steven Johnson via personal service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Pas to Thrifty Payless Holdings, Inc. DBA Rite Aid Corporation via personal service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service x 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 02/01/202210:21 AM; Served: 01/28/20229:15 AM; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/28/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketStatement of Classification and Location

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less