This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:05:46 (UTC).

SFM-6 LLC VS ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 SFM-6 LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0566

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFM-6 LLC

Defendant

ALVAREZ, AUTUMN R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRUTHERS, DENNIS SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County. Pick up Joe Devers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SFM-6 LLC; Awarded Against: ALVAREZ, AUTUMN R; Amount; Damages: $5,068.83; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,358.17; Attorney Fees: $1,010.32; Costs: $246.00; Total: $7683.32; Party: Names: SFM-6 LLC; ALVAREZ, AUTUMN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Andy Maxwell in Support of Default Judgment CCP:585(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketBrief - Comment: in support of Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack - Comment: of Original Executed Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Interest requested exceeds 10% (refer to MO ruling dtd 04/21/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AUTUMN R ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AUTUM R ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less