This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:24 (UTC).

SEVEN OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS HADDAD ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 SEVEN OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HADDAD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1815

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVEN OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

JACK S. HADDAD AS TRUSTEE OF THE JACK AND NUHA FAMILY TRUST

HADDAD, NUHA J.

HADDAD, JACK S.

NUHA J. HADDAD AS TRUSTEE OF THE JACK AND NUHA FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JACK S HADDAD , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO NUHA J HADDAD, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/19/2017; Served: 04/19/2017; Served: 04/19/2017; Served: 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less