This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:11:25 (UTC).

SERRANO VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 SERRANO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0101

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERRANO, GLADYS

Defendant

GARCIA, RITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SERRANO, GLADYS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 641 1/2 D STREET WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: GARCIA, RITA; Party: Names: SERRANO, GLADYS; GARCIA, RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SERRANO, GLADYS; Served: 05/03/20179:57 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less