This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 16:49:43 (UTC).

SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA ET AL VS XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2230

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYERS DANA N

Defendant Attorney

DUBRAWSKI PETER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/24/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

08/24/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

09/02/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/02/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/02/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/29/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

11/14/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

11/14/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Demand for Jury

11/14/2022: Demand for Jury

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Demand for Jury; Filed By: DEFENDANT - XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: DEFENDANT - XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: by XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to XPO logistics freight, Inc., via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet No selection on item 5. Please correct and refile into existing case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 12/16/2022Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT|PLAINTIFF - SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SELF-INSURED SCHOOLS OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUBRAWSKI PETER A. ESQ.