This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 13:31:14 (UTC).

SELENA BLANCHARD INDIVIDUALLY , AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS COTTI FOODS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SELENA BLANCHARD INDIVIDUALLY , AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COTTI FOODS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3413

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELENA BLANCHARD INDIVIDUALLY , AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

COTTI FOODS, LLC

COTTI FOODS CORPORATION

SIGLIN, I. STEVEN

TACO BELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN NOTE, LAURA G.

Defendant Attorney

GRODEN, DARCEY M.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 08/14/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/13/2020 Plaintiff as to Defendant, Cotti Foods Cororation d.b.a. Taco Bell to provide complete responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories, Set One, Interrogatory Numbers 1, 2, 7, and 10; and Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Things, Set One, Request for Numbers 2-9, 11-15, 18, 20-29, 33-35, 37 and 38

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Stipulation and Order, filing is missing complex fee of $1,000. Please resubmit including complex fee and first appearance fee.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Stipulation and Order; First Appearance filng fee and Complex fee is required for Defendant Cottie Foods Corporation.

Ruling

Ruling 03/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Laura Van Note Re: Proof of Service Reason: On Proof of Service 3.b. you need to "Specify name and relationship to the party named in 3.a." The name of the attorney for Cotti Foods Corporation must be listed. Please correct and resubmit. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt is not attached, it was filed separately, please rescan and resubmit all together. As to Notice; Party served in the TO SECTION needs to conform to the First Amended Complaint exactly. This Notice should be attached behind mandatory Judicial Council form POS-010.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Party served does not conform to the First Amended Complaint on file. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Laura Van Note For: Second Amended Complaint RE: Must have leave of court to file Second Amended Complaint.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/ Court Trial 3/22/2021 (17) T/E 2 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared MSJ/MSA/Anti-Slapp - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 07/24/2020 (letter received) Defendant, Motion for Summar Judgment/Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 09/04/2020, Defendant: Cotti Foods Corporation, Motion to Compel Further Requests for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 09/04/2020 Defendant: Cotti Foods Corporation, Motion to Compel Further Responses for Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 08/20/20 (re- notice), 8/14/2020 Plaintiff: Selena Blanchard, individually and behalf of others similarly situated, Motion for Entry of Case Management Order No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: re Reply to Motion for Entry of Case Management Order No 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReply - Comment: re Motion for Entry of Case Management Order No 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Aaron F. Olsen in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order No 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt is not attached, it was filed separately, please rescan and resubmit all together. As to Notice; Party served in the TO SECTION needs to conform to the First Amended Complaint exactly. This Notice should be attached behind mandatory Judicial Council form POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Party served does not conform to the First Amended Complaint on file. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Laura Van Note For: Second Amended Complaint RE: Must have leave of court to file Second Amended Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: on First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 02/13/2020; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less