This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 08:47:50 (UTC).

SEE VS WALLER, Jr.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 SEE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WALLER, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3126

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEE, SHELLIE

Respondent

WALLER, JOHNNY DEAN, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 08/04/2021 PET DV TRO C/C C/V OTHER ORDERS 1 MINOR CONT FROM 09/08/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/04/2021 PET DV TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketFirearms Alleged in Recent Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children - Comment: dv-110

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORRIGAN, GEORGE R