This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 06:51:29 (UTC).

SCOTT KENNETH MANDA DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 SCOTT KENNETH MANDA DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division Justice Building located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2034

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SAWYER, MARY

PARK, CATHERINE K

Decedent

MANDA, SCOTT KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OEHLER NANCY L

STEAD CALVIN R

 

Court Documents

Judgment and Order for Final Distribution

11/17/2022: Judgment and Order for Final Distribution

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

11/02/2022: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Supplement

10/27/2022: Supplement

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

09/21/2022: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Notice of Hearing

10/12/2022: Notice of Hearing

Supplement

10/12/2022: Supplement

Supplement

09/13/2022: Supplement

Compliance Hearing

02/17/2022: Compliance Hearing

Petition for Letters

02/18/2021: Petition for Letters

Notice of Change Name/Address

03/16/2022: Notice of Change Name/Address

Notice of Hearing

03/16/2022: Notice of Hearing

Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution

03/14/2022: Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution

Mail Returned Undelivered

02/22/2022: Mail Returned Undelivered

Inventory and Appraisal

11/04/2021: Inventory and Appraisal

Rejection/Correction Notice

08/25/2021: Rejection/Correction Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

08/06/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

08/10/2021: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Petition for Appntment of Guardian Ad Litem-Probate Ex Parte

08/06/2021: Petition for Appntment of Guardian Ad Litem-Probate Ex Parte

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment and Order for Final Distribution; Comment: Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Administrator, Allowing Administrators Commission and Attorneys Statutory and Extraordinary fees; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Supplement; Comment: Third Supplement to First and Final Account and Report of Administrator; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing; Comment: HRG 11/02/2022 - Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Supplement; Comment: Second Supplement to First and Final Account and Report of Administrator, and Petition for its Settlement, and Petition for Allowance of Administrator's Commission and Attorneys' Statutory and Extraordinary Fees, for Reimbursement of Costs Advanced, for Withholding of Closing Cost Reserve, and for Final Distribution; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Supplement; Comment: Supplement to First and Final Account and Report of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement, and Petition for Allowance of Administrator's Commission and Attorney's Statutory and Extraordinary Fees, for Reimbursement of Costs Advanced, for Withholding of Closing Cost Reserve, and for Final Distribution; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Change Name/Address; Comment: Notice of change of Address; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing; Comment: 9/21/22; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Letters of Administration; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Bond Undertaking; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order For Probate; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of; Comment: Personal Representative; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Letters; Dept.: Bakersfield Division P; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Audio streaming announced.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Publication; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Comment: 2/26/21; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Petition for Letters of Administration; Comment: Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority; Filed By: PETITIONER - SAWYER, MARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEAD CALVIN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OEHLER NANCY L