This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:16:43 (UTC).

SCHOFIELD V SCHOFIELD

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 SCHOFIELD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCHOFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4712

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHOFIELD, KENT DOUGLAS

Respondent

SCHOFIELD, MELINDA LIZETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2014
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: STATUS ENDS 06/04/14 JLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Comment: CT DATE 5/13/2013 MED 5/9/2013 JLF

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2013
  • NP1080 - Comment: Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KENT DOUGLAS SCHOFIELD (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MELINDA LIZETTE SCHOFIELD (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: PARTIES SHALL HAVE JOINT LEGAL AND JOINT PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILDREN. PARTIES TO MAINTAIN THE VISITATION SCHEDULE AS PREVIOUSLY ARRANGED. THE COURT SETS NEXT HEARING DATE ON 05/13/2013 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DIVISION A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: RESP EXPARTE C/C C/V1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: SCHOFIELD, KENT DOUGLAS; Respondent: SCHOFIELD, MELINDA LIZETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Ex Parte Compliance - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: RESP GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for SCHOFIELD, MELINDA LIZETTE (RE-1). Received from SCHOFIELD, MELINDA LIZETTE, check no(s) 239. Receipt #709513 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for SCHOFIELD, KENT DOUGLAS (PE-1). Received from SCHOFIELD, KENT DOUGLAS, check no(s) 1071. Receipt #709250 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 626

    Read MoreRead Less