This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 04:32:18 (UTC).

S.C. ANDERSON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JOSE ROY GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL FORMERLY DBA ROY'S FLOORING, ALSO KNOWN AS ROY'S FLOORING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 S C ANDERSON, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against JOSE ROY GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL FORMERLY DBA ROY'S FLOORING, ALSO KNOWN AS ROY'S FLOORING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2683

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.C. ANDERSON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NORTH AMERICAN SPCIALTY FLOORING, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION, FORMERLY DBA SPORTS SURFACES, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM BUT ALSO KNOWN AS SPORTS SURFACES TRACTION USA

KOSTER AMERICAN CORPORATION DBA KOSTER USA, A FOREIGN CORPORATION LICENSED AND REGISTERED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

JOSE ROY GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL FORMERLY DBA ROY'S FLOORING, ALSO KNOWN AS ROY'S FLOORING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SPORTS SURFACING, INC.

ROY'S FLOORING, INC.

KOSTER AMERICAN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS KOSTER USA

S.C. ANDERSON, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KOSTER AMERCIAN CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS KOSTER USA, A FOREIGN CORPORATOIN LICENSED AND REGISTERD TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KOSTER AMERICAN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS KOSTER USA, A FOREIGN CORPORATION LICENSED AND REGISTERED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

SPORTS SURFACING, INC.

ROY'S FLOORING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MULLEN, RAY T

LOUREIRO, KARL R

MOORE, DONNA E

TANGONAN, KENYA T

GREBOW, ARTHUR J.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PHELAN, CARRIE EILEEN

LOUREIRO, KARL R

MOORE, DONNA E

RUBIN, JULIE H.

TANGONAN, KENYA T

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Rejected pursuant to conversation with Norma on 5/6/19: make changes to the party named by adding Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant in the body of Errata for clarification. Returned via efile

Ruling

Ruling 01/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Julie H. Rubin Document: Summons to Cross-Complaint Does not conform in its entirety to the cross-complaint.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT, MUST BE FILED WITH FORM POS-010

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; MISSING DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDICIAL OFFICERS SIGNATURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 09/14/2020 (17) T/E 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: JT/ FCMC 1/21/2020; TE 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Notice dated 12/05/19, as to Arthur J. Grebow, re-mailed 12/13/2019 to 16133 Ventura Blvd Ste 700, Encino, Ca 91436 along with change of address form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Notice dated 12/05/19, as to Julie H. Rubin, re-mailed 12/13/2019 to 16133 Ventura Blvd Ste 700, Encino, Ca 91436 along with change of address form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: to Vacate and Continue Dates Set for Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Case Management Conference and Jury Trial The within Court, after having read and considered the foregoing Stipulation of the Parties, and good cause appearing therefore, DOES HEREBY ORDER AS FOLLOWS: 1. The date of December 20, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., set for the Mandatory Settlement Conference in Department 10 of this Court, is vacated and continued to August 14, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., or as soon thereafter as the matter may be heard, in Department 10 of this Court; 2. The date of January 21, 2020, previously set for Final Case Management Conference and commencement of Jury Trial in this case, at 9:00 a.m., in Department 17 of this Court, is hereby vacated, with the statutory cutoff dates for Discovery, Discovery Motions, and Expert Exchange dates to be renewed based upon the new trial date to be set by this Court; 3. The new date for the Final Case Management Conference and commencement of the Jury Trial of this matter is to be rescheduled to September 14, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., in Department l7, of the above-entitled Court;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice dated 06/26/2019, re-mailed 07/03/19 to 16133 Ventura Blvd. Ste 700, Encino, Ca 91436 along with change of address form.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Breach of Written Subcontract Agreement 2. Negligence 3. Breach of Express Warranties 4. Breach of Implied Warranties 5. Strict Liability 1. In the caption of the Complaint on page one, line 15, Defendant, "NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY FLOORING, INC." was erroneously misspelled as "NORTH AMERICAN SPCIALTY FLOORING, INC."; by this Amendment, said caption shall be amended to comport with the correct spelling as found in the Complaint at Page 2, Line 12, and shall hereinafter be denoted and read as "NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY FLOORING, INC." IT IS SO ORDERED. ****JUDGE THOMAS S. CLARK****1/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; MISSING DESIGNATED AREA FOR JUDICIAL OFFICERS SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/27/2018; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/1/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.C. ANDERSON, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLEN, RAY T

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANGONAN KENYA T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREBOW ARTHUR